MD HB19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB487
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain county boards of education seeking State funds for the construction of a new school, or the renovation of or an addition to an existing school that would increase the capacity by more than 100 students, to submit a pedestrian safety plan to the Interagency Commission on School Construction; requiring the Interagency Commission to approve the pedestrian safety plan if the plan meets certain qualifications; and requiring a county board to make all determinations about the contents of a pedestrian safety plan.
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-17) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {693426/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-20) |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893921/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2021-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB487 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Students
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Counties
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Maps and Charts
Montgomery County
Pedestrians
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Public Information
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Students
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning