MD HB190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB335
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a first responder who is diagnosed by a licensed psychologist or psychiatrist with post-traumatic stress disorder is presumed under certain circumstances to have an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under workers' compensation law; and specifying that the presumption does not limit any other right or claim an individual may have under workers' compensation law.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
Sponsors
Del. Terri Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to interim study by Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2023-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB335 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1069 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1069 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Claims
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Mental and Behavioral Health
Occupational Safety
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Rescue Squads
Time
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Mental and Behavioral Health
Occupational Safety
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Rescue Squads
Time
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 13 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |