MD HB206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain prohibition relating to licenses to drive and moped operator's permits; and prohibiting a person from engaging in any fraudulent or dishonest conduct in the examination or testing process for the issuance or renewal of a driver's license or moped operator's permit.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623523/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Subjects
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds, and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |