MD HB207 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law related to the adoption of a plumbing code in St. Mary's County.
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |