MD HB216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB101
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the board of directors of a condominium to grant certain interests affecting the common elements of the condominium for the installation and use of leased clean energy equipment.
Title
Condominiums - Common Elements - Clean Energy Equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2024-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-37) |
2024-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-9) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223228/1 Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2024-02-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-08-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB101 (Carry Over) 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB206 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
SB206 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Subjects
Condominiums
Electric Motor Vehicles
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Homeowners Associations
meetings
Notices
Real Property
Solar Energy
Storage
Time
Electric Motor Vehicles
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Homeowners Associations
meetings
Notices
Real Property
Solar Energy
Storage
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |