MD HB217 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public body to make available an agenda containing specified information if the agenda has been determined at the time a public body gives notice of the meeting or, if an agenda has not been determined at the time of the meeting notice, the public body shall make available the agenda at least 24 hours before the meeting; and authorizing a public body to make available an agenda within a reasonable time after a meeting is held under specified circumstances.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for Agendas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {106085/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Notices
Public Information
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Committees and Commissions
Notices
Public Information
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials