MD HB217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a landowner whose land is subject to an agricultural land preservation easement from granting, or allowing a person to establish, an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on the land without prior written permission of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; and authorizing the Foundation to approve an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on land subject to an agricultural land preservation easement under specified circumstances.
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |