MD HB217 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB351
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1210
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations |
2020-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB217 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
HB1210 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
SB900 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1210 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
SB900 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Cannabis
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Exemptions
Income Tax
Laboratories
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0217?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0217f.pdf |