MD HB217 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the number of years before the end of the term of a video lottery operation license that a licensee is required to provide certain notice of intent to renew the license and is authorized to apply for renewal; providing for a 15-year term for a renewed license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission finds the licensee is no longer qualified; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503620/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB403 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |