MD HB218 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, in a prosecution for a specified sexual offense, the court from barring the introduction of specified evidence that the defendant committed a prior sexual offense on the ground that the admission is unfairly prejudicial unless the court makes a specified finding; prohibiting a State's Attorney from introducing specified evidence under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified evidence from being disclosed to a jury or introduced at trial unless the court has held a specified hearing; etc.
Title
Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Evidence
Hearings
Juries
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Trials
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Evidence
Hearings
Juries
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Trials