MD HB234 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from willfully and maliciously killing, injuring, or interfering with the use of a certain service animal in a certain manner, or allowing a certain animal to kill, injure, or interfere with the use of a certain service animal in a certain manner; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act of up to 2 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $2,500, or both; and authorizing a court to order a certain defendant to pay full restitution for all damages arising out of the offense as a condition of sentencing.
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-2) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {822613/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {822613/1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-15 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB607 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Subjects
Animals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
defendants
Dogs
Fines
Injury
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
defendants
Dogs
Fines
Injury
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 626 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |