MD HB244 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain civil penalties for violations of the Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to annually increase the maximum and minimum civil penalties, beginning in 2025, by the percentage increase, if any, in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers or a successor index published by the federal Bureau of Labor Statistics.
Title
Maryland Occupational Safety and Health Act - Civil Penalties - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Floor Amendment 393829/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - Floor Amendment 393829/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104 |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-36) |
2024-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-14 | House | Floor Amendment {393829/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (38-100) |
2024-02-13 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803825/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2023-09-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Offenses
Consumer Price Index
Federal Government
Fines
Labor and Industry, Division of
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Consumer Price Index
Federal Government
Fines
Labor and Industry, Division of
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 5 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |