MD HB247 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Victim Services Unit in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; transferring existing functions and operations of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board and the sexual assault forensic examinations program to the Unit; requiring the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board office to remain in Baltimore City until at least July 1, 2020, for the purpose of accepting claims, providing assistance on filing claims, and holding hearings; requiring certain employees to maintain a certain work location; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senators Hough, Lee, and Kelley |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez, and McComas |
2018-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-05 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {638473/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {502819/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appropriations
Chemical Tests
Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Reports
Restitution
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Chemical Tests
Child Abuse and Neglect
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Liability
Parole and Probation
Privacy
Reports
Restitution
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment