MD HB249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB967
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain DNA sample to be collected in a certain manner from an individual who is required to register as a sex offender; requiring a DNA sample to be collected by a certain individual or at a certain location under certain circumstances; prohibiting a DNA sample from being tested and placed in a certain statewide DNA database system until certain conditions are met; prohibiting an individual from refusing to provide a DNA sample as required; and requiring certain DNA samples or records to be destroyed and expunged.
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2024-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583424/1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-09-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB967 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Data
Evidence
Expungement
Genetics
Grand Juries
Laboratories
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Police, Department of
State's Attorneys
Trials
Warrants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Data
Evidence
Expungement
Genetics
Grand Juries
Laboratories
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Police, Department of
State's Attorneys
Trials
Warrants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |