MD HB250 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB11
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Private Well Safety Program in the Department of the Environment to address and manage the contamination of certain private and domestic water supply wells in the State; establishing the Private Well Safety Fund to award grants to certain counties and households for costs associated with water quality testing and remediation; requiring the Department to utilize an online portal to receive and upload water quality testing results and certain information and to provide public access to the information; etc.
Title
Private Well Safety Act of 2022
Sponsors
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Floor Amendment 223721/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - Floor Amendment 223721/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {943628/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-33) |
2022-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | Floor Amendment {223721/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (37-96) |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {523322/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB250 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hester) Adopted
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Commercial Property
Contracts
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
internet
Laboratories
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Wells
Commercial Property
Contracts
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
internet
Laboratories
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Wells
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 4A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 4A-13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-4A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 10 | 713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |