MD HB253 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making alterations and clarifications related to the duties of the Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission, the Office of Social Equity, the Advisory Board on Medical and Adult-Use Cannabis, and the Maryland Cannabis Administration; altering the membership of the Commission; requiring the Advisory Board to elect a chair and removing the Director of the Administration as chair; authorizing processors to provide cannabis to cannabis licensees; providing that certain violations may be charged by a citation; etc.
Title
Cannabis Reform - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-21) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {973422/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-22) |
2024-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473324/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2023-10-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Attorney General
Cannabis
Cannabis Administration, Maryland
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Citations
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Drugs
Elections
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Ex-Offenders
Federal Government
Fines
Forms
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Interest
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Minority Business Enterprises
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Racial Matters
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Weights and Measures
Women
Zoning and Planning
Advertising
Attorney General
Cannabis
Cannabis Administration, Maryland
Cannabis Distribution
Cannabis Production
Citations
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Drugs
Elections
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Ex-Offenders
Federal Government
Fines
Forms
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Interest
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Minority Business Enterprises
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Racial Matters
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Time
Weights and Measures
Women
Zoning and Planning