MD HB283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to award to a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified actions seeking to remedy a violation of a Maryland constitutional right; authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and expenses to a prevailing defendant under specified circumstances; establishing that specified limits on attorney's fees under the Maryland Tort Claims Act do not apply to a specified award of attorney's fees and expenses; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. David Moon [D] |
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-50) (Y: 87 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-50) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Vogt) Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {992613/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties
Courts
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
State Employees
Torts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties
Courts
Liability
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
State Employees
Torts