MD HB289 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain restrictive provisions limiting the power and rights of the State from being included in State contracts; specifying that certain provisions are void if included in a State contract; and specifying the applicable law and interpretation of State contracts.
Title
State Contracts - Prohibited Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {413826/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533121/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB375 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |