MD HB296 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under certain circumstances for a certain amount of retirement income attributable to certain employment as a correctional officer; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {863225/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {989134/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {995769/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |