MD HB297 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding prekindergarten services to specified 4-year-old children; establishing the Prekindergarten Expansion Grant Program; providing expansion grants may be used for establishing or expanding existing half-day and full-day prekindergarten programs for specified eligible children, and establishing or expanding existing Judy Centers for families of specified children; requiring a qualified vendor who has received a grant in the current year to be awarded a grant in the following year under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-33) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-33) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Hixson) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Carr) {923227/1 Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {265960/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Names
Planning, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students
Child Care
Children
Education
Education, State Department of
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Minors
Names
Planning, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Students