MD HB297 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Department of Juvenile Services governing juvenile care facilities and juvenile detention facilities include a requirement for the establishment, implementation, and revision of safety plans related to the persons in the care of the facility; requiring residential centers and group homes to establish, implement, and revise a certain safety plan; requiring regulations adopted by the Behavioral Health Administration to include a revision for safety plans every 5 years; etc.
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623421/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB3 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Disabled
Group Homes
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Safety
Disabled
Group Homes
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |