MD HB298 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Health Services Cost Review Commission, consistent with Maryland's all-payer model contract, to establish hospital rate levels and rate increases in a specified manner and promote and approve specified alternative methods of rate determination and payment; increasing the total amount of specified user fees that the Commission may assess; requiring the Commission to make a report, beginning October 1, 2014, and every 6 months thereafter, to specified individuals and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Stocksdale) {173126/1 Rejected (36-88) (Y: 36 N: 88 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Boteler) {943726/1 Rejected (39-82) (Y: 39 N: 82 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (George) {173425/1 Rejected (39-76) (Y: 39 N: 76 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {513620/1 Rejected (37-77) (Y: 37 N: 77 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Stocksdale) {173126/1 Rejected (36-88) (Y: 36 N: 88 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Boteler) {943726/1 Rejected (39-82) (Y: 39 N: 82 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (George) {173425/1 Rejected (39-76) (Y: 39 N: 76 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {513620/1 Rejected (37-77) (Y: 37 N: 77 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-43) |
2014-03-17 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Stocksdale) {173126/1 Rejected (36-88) |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {943726/1 Rejected (39-82) |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {173425/1 Rejected (39-76) |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {513620/1 Rejected (37-77) |
2014-03-14 | House | Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {856688/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Budgets
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Managed Care Organizations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Nursing Homes
Prices
Public Information
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Managed Care Organizations
Mergers and Acquisitions
Notices
Nursing Homes
Prices
Public Information
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations