MD HB317 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee, in consultation with certain units of State government and other stakeholders, to develop, by January 1, 2023, a certain methodology for a unit to estimate greenhouse gas emissions of food and beverages procured, to establish a certain baseline measurement by January 1, 2024, and to consider the nutrition of individuals fully or partially dependent on the State for their diet when developing strategies; etc.
Title
Maryland Green Purchasing Committee - Food and Beverage Procurement - Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 85 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 85 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-41) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (40-85) |
2021-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB772 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Food
General Services, Department of
Health
Pollution
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Food
General Services, Department of
Health
Pollution
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 14 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |