MD HB335 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB160
Note: Carry Over of previous HB873
Note: Carry Over of previous HB873
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to an individual who simultaneously holds an elected public office and is on the ballot for the national presidential nominating convention or holds the office of delegate to the national presidential nominating convention; prohibiting individuals from simultaneously being a candidate for a party office and an elected public office; and prohibiting individuals from simultaneously holding a party office and an elected public office.
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-38) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105961/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-06-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB335 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
HB873 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB873 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 5 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |