MD HB347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the authorized uses of the Cybersecurity Investment Fund and the Enterprise Fund within the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to include authorizing specified companies to use funding received from the Fund to assist in the repayment of higher education loans owed by employees of the company who meet specified income limits; requiring companies that use specified funding to assist specified employees in the repayment of higher education loans to provide a specified amount of company funding to the employees; etc.
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Fund and Enterprise Fund - Higher Education Loan Repayment - Expanded Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled (Economic Matters) |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Appropriations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation