MD HB353 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from requiring an individual to work during a specified time period on a day in which the individual is expected to perform jury service or acts related to jury service, or on a day after the individual performs jury service or acts related to jury service; and prohibiting an employer from depriving an individual of employment or coercing, intimidating, or threatening to discharge an individual for exercising a specified right to refrain from work for performing jury service or acts relating to jury service.
Title
Jury Service - Employers - Prohibited Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment Rejected (Y: 18 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment Rejected (Y: 18 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (26-20) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Committee Amendment Rejected (18-26) | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments 298875/1 | |
2012-03-27 | Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 298875/1 | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (98-34) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 202912/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Judiciary |