MD HB356 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Senators Raskin, Frosh, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Senators Raskin, Frosh, and Shank
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the statewide application of provisions of law governing the towing or removal of vehicles from parking lots; establishing a motor vehicle towing, recovery, and storage lien on a towed motor vehicle on behalf of the tower or agent for specified charges; prohibiting a motor vehicle towing, recovery, and storage lienor from selling the motor vehicle to which the lien is attached under specified circumstances; specifying the manner in which a motor vehicle towing, recovery, and storage lienor may sell a vehicle; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Practices and Procedures
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Sen. Mary James [D] |
Del. Doyle Niemann [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Senators Raskin, Frosh, and Shank | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) | |
2011-04-03 | Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Edwards) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-23 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-05 | Delegates Niemann, Malone, and Norman | |
2011-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-05 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-05 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (130-9) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-07 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors
Auctions
Checks
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Credit
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Liability
License Plates
Licenses
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Signs and Billboards
Storage
Titles
Towing
Trucks
Wreckers and Scrap Processors