MD HB356 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Military Personnel and Service-Disabled Veterans No-Interest Loan Program to be the Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program; expanding the no-interest loan program to include all veteran-owned businesses; etc.
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |