MD HB357 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain farm owner or operator from knowingly confining egg-laying hens in an enclosure in a certain manner, subject to certain exceptions, on and after January 1, 2026; prohibiting a business owner or operator or a farm owner or operator from selling shell eggs or egg products under certain circumstances on and after January 1, 2026; and specifying that a certain certification be obtained in a certain manner to sell shell eggs and egg products.
Title
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB193 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-11 - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB690 (Carry Over) 2023-02-26 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB690 (Carry Over) 2023-02-26 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Birds
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Domestic Animals
Farmers and Farming
Fines
Food
Housing
Independent Contractors
Inspections
Licenses
Livestock
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Wholesale Distribution
Agriculture, Department of
Birds
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Domestic Animals
Farmers and Farming
Fines
Food
Housing
Independent Contractors
Inspections
Licenses
Livestock
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Wholesale Distribution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 3 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 3 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 4 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0357?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0357f.pdf |