MD HB37 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of a public record to provide specified applicants with a copy of the public record in a specified electronic format under specified circumstances; establishing an exception; authorizing a custodian to remove specified metadata from specified documents; clarifying that a specified act does not constitute creating a new public record; authorizing a custodian to charge an applicant a fee under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
State Government - Access to Public Records - Electronic Documents
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Tom Hucker [D] |
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] | Del. Heather Mizeur [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-08 | Delegates Reznik, Pena-Melnyk, and Ready | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-17 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |