MD HB37 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the ability of an employer to establish standards concerning an employee's dress and grooming that are directly related to the nature of the employment of the employee does not allow the employer to require or prohibit specific hairstyles or facial hair or prohibit an employee from wearing clothing or adopting modes of grooming based on sex.
Title
Employment Discrimination - Dress and Grooming Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-10-21 | House | Pre-filed |