MD HB37 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology; altering the name of the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology (CREST); altering the name of the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology Governing Board; altering the powers and duties of the Board to require the Board to operate and exercise general control over Frederick CREST; requiring the Board to submit an adopted mission statement to the Maryland Higher Education Commission; etc.
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2015-02-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {404066/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Frederick County
Higher Education
Names
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Emergency Bills
Frederick County
Higher Education
Names
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment