MD HB373 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to a home detention program in Cecil County; authorizing the Sheriff of Cecil County to establish home detention, pretrial release, work release, and prerelease programs; requiring the Sheriff to adopt regulations necessary to implement the programs; providing that a certain condition imposed by a court supersedes a certain regulation under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to allow a certain individual to participate in a program established under the Act at a certain time; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Home Detention and Release Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Cecil County
Community Facilities and Services
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Fees
Home Detention
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Community Facilities and Services
Counties - Local Laws
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Fees
Home Detention
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment