MD HB378 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an individual shall have received at a minimum a degree from a college or university accredited by an educational accrediting association as required by the Commission on Dietetic Registration to be licensed as a dietician-nutritionist.
Title
State Board of Dietetic Practice - Dietitian-Nutritionists - Application Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Pam Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 961 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993827/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB330 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Associations
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Education
Health Occupations
Licenses
Registration
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Education
Health Occupations
Licenses
Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 5 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |