MD HB379 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from allowing for the participation of a bear, a cougar, an elephant, a jaguar, a leopard, a lion, a nonhuman primate, a tiger, or a hybrid of any of these animals in a traveling animal act; and providing a civil penalty of $2,000 per violation.
Title
Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597 |
2024-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-28) |
2024-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-7) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373820/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-34) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {203427/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB547 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Subjects
Animals
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Law Enforcement
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads
Special Events
Transportation
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Law Enforcement
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Motor Vehicles
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads
Special Events
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 2C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 10 | 2C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |