MD HB382 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain statutory language to clarify that a person who has been charged with any civil offense or infraction, except a juvenile offense, may file a petition for expungement of certain records under certain circumstances.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Civil Offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |