MD HB383 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying and placing limitations on the borrowing authority of the Maryland Stadium Authority; altering provisions relating to the money to be deposited in the Camden Yards Fund for specified purposes; altering provisions relating to the Comptroller's distribution of specified lottery revenues into the Maryland Stadium Facilities Fund; requiring the Comptroller to pay specified sports lottery revenues into the State General Fund; requiring the State Lottery Agency to conduct sports lotteries as specified; etc.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Bonding, Financing, and Revenue Limitations -
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Michael McDermott [R] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Advertising
Bonds
Comptroller
Construction
Loans
Lottery
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Bonds
Comptroller
Construction
Loans
Lottery
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0383.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0383f.pdf |