MD HB383 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education and specified nonpublic schools to develop and implement a specified program relating to sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention; and requiring a specified program to be incorporated into the health curriculum of each county board of education and each nonpublic school.
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-2) |
2015-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {275760/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education, State Board of
Health
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Teachers
Education, State Board of
Health
Job Training
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Teachers