MD HB383 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "owner" to repeal the exclusion of motor vehicle rental companies as owners of motor vehicles for the purpose of enforcing violations of entering an intersection against a red signal indication that are recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system; requiring an agency to provide a certain notice to a motor vehicle rental company before issuing a citation for a violation recorded by a traffic control monitoring system; etc.
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies – Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-08-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Citations
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Oaths
Reports
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Citations
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Highways
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Notices
Oaths
Reports
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |