MD HB390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use or maintenance of an improper or outdated address in documents filed for inclusion in records of the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; authorizing a person listed as an owner of real property in the Department's records to file an affidavit with the Department stating that the property's address on record with the Department is being used or maintained in violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Use or Maintenance of Improper or Outdated Addresses in Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-19) |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Associations
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Fraud
Identification
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Petitions
Postal Service
Real Property
Records
Time
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Associations
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Fraud
Identification
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Petitions
Postal Service
Real Property
Records
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 1 | 201.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |