MD HB40 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that single-occupancy public restrooms be marked with gender-inclusive signage that does not indicate a specific gender, contains certain descriptive language, and contains a picture or icon that does not indicate a specific gender in certain places of public accommodation and certain public buildings; providing that a county is responsible for enforcing the signage requirement in places of public accommodation; and authorizing a county to set certain fines for second and subsequent violations after a certain period of time.
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
2022-10-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB84 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-16 - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
HB572 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB572 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Counties
Counties - Generally
Fines
Gender
Human Relations
Municipalities
Public Buildings and Facilities
restrooms
Signs and Billboards
Counties - Generally
Fines
Gender
Human Relations
Municipalities
Public Buildings and Facilities
restrooms
Signs and Billboards
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0040?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0040f.pdf |