MD HB403 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight to require the correction of any underfunding, including interest, due to a preneed trust account.
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Preneed Trust Account - Underfunding
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Economic Matters |