MD HB424 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale any juvenile product, mattress, upholstered furniture, or reupholstered furniture that contains more than 0.1% of flame-retardant chemicals by mass; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the importing, sale, or offering for sale of any child care product containing certain chemicals; establishing certain civil penalties; requiring the Secretary of Health to consider certain factors in determining the amount of a certain penalty; etc.
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Gabriel Acevero [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D] |
Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Ken Kerr [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-34) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {806389/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Subjects
Age
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Courts
Equipment
Fines
Fire Protection
Foreign Trade
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Courts
Equipment
Fines
Fire Protection
Foreign Trade
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |