MD HB424 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County hold public hearings on assisted family housing proposals; and repealing the requirement that the Montgomery Commission publish a summary of the Montgomery Commission's annual financial report in certain newspapers.
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission - Alterations MC 3-24
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339 |
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Low-Income
Montgomery County
News Media
Notices
Open Government
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Low-Income
Montgomery County
News Media
Notices
Open Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 16 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |