MD HB431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that relate to exemptions for specified persons engaged in the business of manufacturing in St. Mary's County from specified taxes under specified circumstances.
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Exemptions
Industry and Technology
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Exemptions
Industry and Technology
St. Mary's County
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local