MD HB44 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a committee may not vote on bills or on amendments with a fiscal impact unless a fiscal note is posted on the website of the General Assembly for at least 5 days; requiring the fiscal note to identify the sources of any assumptions that the Department of Legislative Services used in preparing the estimates of fiscal impact; etc.
Title
State Spending Procedure - Fiscal Notes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2009-10-22 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Reports
State Documents
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Reports
State Documents
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0044.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0044f.pdf |