MD HB44 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a holder of a Class C beer and light wine license or a Class C beer, wine, and liquor license from certain hours-of-sale restrictions in the area of Baltimore City bounded by Liberty Heights Avenue, Northern Parkway, Druid Park Drive, and Wabash Avenue.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsors
Del. Bilal Ali [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Blue Laws
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Blue Laws
Retail Sales