MD HB44 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending and altering, for fiscal years 2021 through 2023, the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program for the purchase of certain electric vehicles; increasing from $1,200,000 to $1,800,000 the amount of rebates that the Maryland Energy Administration may issue; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Maryland Department of the Environment to submit a report by January 15, 2022, to certain committees of the General Assembly providing information on proposed changes to the vehicle emissions inspection program; etc.
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-39) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-10) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {137472/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-29) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {600310/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Consumer Protection
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Excise Tax
Fees
Investments
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Consumer Protection
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Excise Tax
Fees
Investments
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 2009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |