MD HB448 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim January 13 as Korean American Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge certain organizations to observe Korean American Day properly.
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB387 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-13 - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Awareness and Outreach
Ethnic Affairs
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Awareness and Outreach
Ethnic Affairs
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |