MD HB45 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the sale, barter, or exchange of a legally acquired mounted specimen of a game bird, excluding a migratory game bird, or game mammal, from a decedent's estate and the specimen is part of the personal property being liquidated or distributed.
Title
Natural Resources - Sale, Barter, or Exchange of Mounted Specimens From Decedent's Estate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |